U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-00014
  • Case Name: Kenney v. Martorello et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transfer Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Quash]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.