U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-30411-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lowe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Travel ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Transferring Defendant to Answer Charges Pending in Another District]
  • October 01, 2024: [Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2024: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 30, 2024: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 26, 2024: [Rule 5(c)(3) Petition for Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.