U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ziolkowski
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Regarding Transport of Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Competency Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (All)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order re Forensic Report and Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Status Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender (ND)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.