U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mc-51057
  • Case Name: Halderman v. Herring Networks, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Media File/Physical Object]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Seal]
  • October 09, 2024: [Strike]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2024: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Seal]
  • October 04, 2024: [Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.