U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dunson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Regarding Transport of Defendant]
January, 2025
  • January 05, 2025: [Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Rule 5(f) Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.