U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tikkanen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 02, 2025: [Bond ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report and Recommendation Regarding Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Protective Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.