U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20470-5
  • Case Name: USA v. King, et. al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Appear*]
  • May 12, 2025: [Text-Only Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [Joinder/Concurrence]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Joinder/Concurrence]
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion - Free]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Produce ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Joinder/Concurrence]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sever]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion - Free]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Detention Order]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.