U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Preston et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Regarding Additional Sentencing Conditions]
  • May 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Restricted Access Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendation Regarding Plea]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.