U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bush
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report and Recommendation Regarding Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Protective Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.