U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-02025
  • Case Name: Orders Rejecting Not Linked to a Case
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Rejecting Pleading]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.