U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Regarding Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty (Proposed)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty (Proposed)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty (Proposed)]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Pretrial and Jury Trial]
  • March 10, 2025: [Rule 5(f) Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.