U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-20485-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 02, 2025: [Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion - Free]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appear*]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.