U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kuhl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • May 08, 2025: [Restricted Access Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 07, 2025: [Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Produce ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (All)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 15, 2025: [Strike ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Compel ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Fee]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sanctions ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Fee]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Additional Access While in Custody]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Objection]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Fee]
  • March 13, 2025: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Regarding Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.