U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-20187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reinstating and Continuing Bond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bond ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear*]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear*]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion - Free]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.