U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-po-30001-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Klein
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Show Cause ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal*]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal*]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.