U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chitwood
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.