U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-30161-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Robert
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • March 19, 2025: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.