U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20094-2
  • Case Name: USA v. LACKEY ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 28, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.