U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Pretrial and Jury Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Rule 5(f) Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.