U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20582-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Detention Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion - Free]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Hearing on Motion*]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.