U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mc-50245
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Doren
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Petition/Request/Application]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Petition/Request/Application]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
  • March 28, 2025: [Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection - Free]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.