U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20202-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Sykes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion - Free]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion - Free]
  • April 11, 2025: [Discovery ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion - Free]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bond ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.