U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-20189-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2025: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Probation Form 12c/Emergency Form 12c-2]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.