U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-30201-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. De La Cruz Alvarado
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.