U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-20559-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • April 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.