U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spelich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (ND)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request and Proposed Order to Permit Firearm to Enter the Courthouse]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)]
  • April 17, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.