U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilmurth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Variance under 18 U.S.C. 3553(a)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.