U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olguin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Pretrial and Jury Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2025: [Rule 5(f) Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.