U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trejo-Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Appeared]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (All)]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Appeared]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Holding Defendant For Proceedings Before The Grand Jury]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 5(f) Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.