U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-30216-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Glapinski
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 10, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.