U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-43810-tjt
  • Case Name: Gail A. Davidson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Certificate of Final Installment/Fees Paid/Bar Debtor (virtual)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Chapter 7 Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [none]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Striking Document (text)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Amended Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Striking Document - Initial Documents (7 Days) - text]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Notice of Missing Documents]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevenson, Michael [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.