U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-30236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • April 18, 2025: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.