U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-43990-mlo
  • Case Name: Richard Moorlet and Zelda Moorlet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Notice of Debtor(s) Address Change]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClarty, Homer W. [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.