U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-43987-mlo
  • Case Name: Lakeshia Matthews
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Certificate of Service (batch)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Payment Order]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Terry, Tammy L. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.