U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-43997-mar
  • Case Name: Jason Craig Steingold
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Directing the Filing of Official Form(s)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Striking Document (text)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Striking Document (text)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Schedule H]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Schedule D]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Schedule C]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Deficiency Notice (BK)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Striking Document (text)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Amend]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Striking Document - Initial Documents (7 Days) - text]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Directing the Filing of Official Form(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Notice of Failure to Submit Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Deficiency Notice (BK)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Notice of Missing Documents]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nathan, Kenneth [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.