U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30849-jda
  • Case Name: Matthew C. Peterfi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Schedules A-J]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, Randall L [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.