U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30850
  • Case Name: Sheila Renee Brown and Dennis George Brown Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Certificate of Service (batch)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (BATCH)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Final Decree and Case Closed]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Acknowledgement of Intra-District Transferred Case]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Change Venue]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Striking Document (text)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Change Venue]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Chapter 13 Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Notice of Missing Documents]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caouette, Melissa A [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.