U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-44046-tjt
  • Case Name: Stephanie M Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shapiro, Mark H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.