open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-41160
    Party Name:Claudia Page
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Close bankruptcy case]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report Certification]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Order awarding compensation]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Chapter 7 trustee's final report]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Report of trustee (re: sale, settlement or lease)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing re: Notice to file claims]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB General notice of settlement or compromise]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of assets and notice to creditors]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457698
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =