open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31231
    Party Name:Barbara Jean Winter Martin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Extend time for filing complaint - motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Employ professional - aplcn]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Motion to extend time for filing complaint objecting to discharge]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB US Trustee report in favor of employment]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Application to employ professional]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded- Initial Report on trustee menu]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457714
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =