open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-50476
    Party Name:James R Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Amend application - aplcn]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Amended application]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Employ professional - aplcn]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB US Trustee report in favor of employment]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Application to employ professional]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?459371
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =