open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-50475
    Party Name:Tyler Frank Halligan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Relief from stay - motion]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Motion for relief from stay (fee)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Third party guaranty for payment of attorney fees]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Third party guaranty for payment of attorney fees]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?459370
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =