open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-05013
    Party Name:LUND v. Reunion Student Loan Finance Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Close adversary case]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Disposition of adversary]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Judgment]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Stipulation of dismissal]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Default judgment - aplcn]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Public entry]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Application for default judgment]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Order for trial]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Answer to complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Summons for adversary proceeding]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 5 Chapter: [MNB Complaint (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?459369
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =