open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-32222
    Party Name:Richard Lee Borge
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (fees)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Relief from stay - motion]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Withdrawal]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Report of chapter 13 trustee re motion for relief from stay]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion for relief from stay (fee)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Hearing continued other]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Withdrawal of motion (text only)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Objection to confirmation of ch 13 plan]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Preconfirmation)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion to dismiss chapter 13 case]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:July 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?460173
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =