open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-32550
    Party Name:TODD JON WARNBERG
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Waiver of chapter 7 filing fee (Form 103B) - aplcn]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Notice of important information for pro se debtors]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of important information for pro se debtors]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Application to have the chapter 7 filing fee waived]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461050
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =