open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-06015
    Party Name:Stearns County Human Services v. Fuches
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Close adversary case]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Disposition of adversary]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Judgment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Stipulation or agreement]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Pro bono notice to defendants]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Summons for adversary proceeding]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [none]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 6 Chapter: [MNB Complaint (fee)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461049
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =