open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-32549
    Party Name:Judith Marie Buckley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:November 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Notice of change of address]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Order re: status of amended schedule]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [none]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461047
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =