open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-32850
    Party Name:Kalley A Leitner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Relief from stay - motion]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [none]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Motion for relief from stay (fee)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461869
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =