open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-42777
    Party Name:David K Kostuch
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of transfer of claim]
    Date Published:December 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Transfer of claim]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Withdrawal of motion (text only)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Hearing continued re: ch 13 case]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Hearing continued other]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion to dismiss or convert chapter 13 to chapter 7]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice by chapter 13 trustee of non-concluded meeting]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461868
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =