open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-50713
    Party Name:Michaelle L Douglas
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461867
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =